This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 10/16/2023 at 18:31:35 (UTC).

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY VS DOMBROWSKI, ALBERT Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2023 UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DOMBROWSKI, ALBERT. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

DOMBROWSKI, ALBERT

DOMBROWSKI, JOYCE

DOMBROWSKI, ANDREA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORTESE, DAWN MARIE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/20/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

9/20/2023: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASES MANAGEMENT REPORT

9/20/2023: NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASES MANAGEMENT REPORT

NOTICE - CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PROTOCOLS

9/20/2023: NOTICE - CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PROTOCOLS

PAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #2023091306

9/22/2023: PAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #2023091306

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ALBERT DOMBROWSKI - ISSUED 9/29/2023

9/26/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ALBERT DOMBROWSKI - ISSUED 9/29/2023

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOYCE DOMBROWSKI - ISSUED 9/29/2023

9/26/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOYCE DOMBROWSKI - ISSUED 9/29/2023

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ANDREA DOMBROWSKI - ISSUED 9/29/2023

9/26/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ANDREA DOMBROWSKI - ISSUED 9/29/2023

PAYMENT $30.00 RECEIPT #2023092661

9/27/2023: PAYMENT $30.00 RECEIPT #2023092661

 

Docket Entries

09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT $30.00 RECEIPT #2023092661

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ANDREA DOMBROWSKI - ISSUED 9/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOYCE DOMBROWSKI - ISSUED 9/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ALBERT DOMBROWSKI - ISSUED 9/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $330.00; Amount Paid: $330.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT - COUNTY; Total Fee: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #2023091306

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASES MANAGEMENT REPORT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less