This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 06/13/2023 at 18:11:22 (UTC).

BEE LINE CALIBRATIONS LLC VS DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/14/2023 BEE LINE CALIBRATIONS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEE LINE CALIBRATIONS LLC

Defendant

PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ENGELBRECHT, CHASE

Defendant Attorney

ZAKHER, MARLYNE

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023037256

4/14/2023: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023037256

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- DAIRYLAND INSURQNCE COMPANY

4/14/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- DAIRYLAND INSURQNCE COMPANY

NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND PIP ADDENDUM

4/14/2023: NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND PIP ADDENDUM

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

4/14/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

4/14/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

4/14/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

4/14/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

4/14/2023: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

RESPONSE - PRIVILEGE LOG - PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORP

5/30/2023: RESPONSE - PRIVILEGE LOG - PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORP

RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

5/30/2023: RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE - REQUEST ADMISSIONS

5/23/2023: RESPONSE - REQUEST ADMISSIONS

ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORP

5/23/2023: ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORP

ORDER - SUBSTITUTE PARTY

5/16/2023: ORDER - SUBSTITUTE PARTY

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

5/16/2023: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ORDER - AGREED - STIPULATION

5/16/2023: ORDER - AGREED - STIPULATION

MOTION - TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

5/11/2023: MOTION - TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

5/11/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

STIPULATION - TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY

5/11/2023: STIPULATION - TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - PRIVILEGE LOG - PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - REQUEST ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 2; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - SUBSTITUTE PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - AGREED - STIPULATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500; Total Fee: $175.00; Amount Paid: $175.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023037256

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- DAIRYLAND INSURQNCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 05/16/2023 AT 9:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND PIP ADDENDUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less