This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/20/2021 at 07:17:23 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA, WHITE, JANICE Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/27/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA, WHITE, JANICE was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Defendant

WHITE, JANICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPINOZZA, KEVIN

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT - JANICE WHITE

5/13/2020: DEFAULT - JANICE WHITE

AFFIDAVIT

5/12/2020: AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

5/12/2020: AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - JANICE WHITE

5/12/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - JANICE WHITE

NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

4/17/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

3/5/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

SUMMONS SERVED - JANICE WHITE

3/14/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - JANICE WHITE

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019021189

2/27/2019: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019021189

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JANICE WHITE- ISSUED 02/27/2019

2/27/2019: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JANICE WHITE- ISSUED 02/27/2019

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

2/27/2019: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

2/27/2019: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/27/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

2/27/2019: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 5B; Description:LACK OF PROSECUTION ;Court Result:CANC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 5B; Description:LACK OF PROSECUTION ;Court Result:Continued Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - JANICE WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - JANICE WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketLACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 08/12/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN 5B , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketLACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 05/20/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN 5B , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - JANICE WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019021189

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JANICE WHITE- ISSUED 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less