This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 18:52:36 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA VS RAY, JOY L

Case Summary

On 05/25/2018 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RAY, JOY L. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 SC

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Defendant

RAY, JOY L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPINOZZA, KEVIN

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

7/23/2019: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

6/13/2019: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

STIPULATION - FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

6/5/2019: STIPULATION - FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

SUMMONS SERVED - JOY L RAY

5/20/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - JOY L RAY

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

6/20/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018054648

5/25/2018: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018054648

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- JOY L RAY

5/25/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- JOY L RAY

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

5/25/2018: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

5/25/2018: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

ORDER OF DISMISSAL - BASED ON SETTLEMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019079491)

6/13/2019: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - BASED ON SETTLEMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019079491)

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - PLURIES

5/8/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - PLURIES

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2019046009

5/7/2019: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2019046009

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

8/15/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018065995

6/27/2018: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018065995

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY

6/27/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY

SUMMONS NON SERVED - JOY L RAY

6/25/2018: SUMMONS NON SERVED - JOY L RAY

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

5/25/2018: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS- PROPOSED- JOY L RAY

5/25/2018: SUMMONS- PROPOSED- JOY L RAY

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL - APPROVING STIPULATION - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019079490)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL - BASED ON SETTLEMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019079491)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - JOY L RAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - PLURIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 06/13/2019 AT 9:00 AM IN H , JDG: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2019046009

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2018
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$330.00; Amount Paid:$330.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018054648

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- JOY L RAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 06/20/2018 AT 9:00 AM IN H , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED- JOY L RAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less