This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 18:06:27 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA VS JIMENEZ, MARVIN F

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JIMENEZ, MARVIN F. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Defendant

JIMENEZ, MARVIN F

Sarasota, FL 34235-8007

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPINOZZA, KEVIN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/24/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

11/24/2021: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

11/24/2021: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

11/24/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

AFFIDAVIT- NON MILITARY

11/24/2021: AFFIDAVIT- NON MILITARY

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

11/24/2021: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021099975

11/24/2021: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021099975

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - MARVIN F JIMENEZ

12/7/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - MARVIN F JIMENEZ

SUMMONS SERVED - MARVIN F JIMENEZ

12/20/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - MARVIN F JIMENEZ

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

12/28/2021: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

12/30/2021: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

STIPULATION - CONSENT JUDGMENT

1/18/2022: STIPULATION - CONSENT JUDGMENT

REPORT - MEDIATOR

1/21/2022: REPORT - MEDIATOR

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT - MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - CONSENT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • HearingTime:11:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - MARVIN F JIMENEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - MARVIN F JIMENEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 12/28/2021 AT 11:30 AM IN 2 , JDG: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021099975

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - MARVIN F JIMENEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT- NON MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin