This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/25/2022 at 03:21:32 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA VS HAIDAI, LARA

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HAIDAI, LARA. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GALEN, PHYLLIS R and DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 SC

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Defendant

HAIDAI, LARA

North Port, FL 34286-6791

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPINOZZA, KEVIN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/24/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

11/24/2021: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

11/24/2021: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

11/24/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

AFFIDAVIT- NON MILITARY

11/24/2021: AFFIDAVIT- NON MILITARY

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

11/24/2021: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021099968

11/24/2021: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021099968

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - LARA HAIDAI

12/10/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - LARA HAIDAI

SUMMONS SERVED - LARA HAIDAI

12/23/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - LARA HAIDAI

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

1/5/2022: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ORDER - ENTRY OF DEFAULT

1/12/2022: ORDER - ENTRY OF DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT - COSTS

1/18/2022: AFFIDAVIT - COSTS

AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

1/18/2022: AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

AFFIDAVIT

1/18/2022: AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF NON COMPLIANCE CORRESPONDENCE

1/21/2022: NOTICE OF NON COMPLIANCE CORRESPONDENCE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON COMPLIANCE CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - LARA HAIDAI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - LARA HAIDAI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 01/05/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021099968

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - LARA HAIDAI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT- NON MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin