This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 09/20/2022 at 17:01:35 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA VS GHERING, SHEA K

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GHERING, SHEA K. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 SC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Defendant

GHERING, SHEA K

North Port, FL 34288-6340

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DEBSKI, MICHAEL

STERN, DOMINIC

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/11/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

8/11/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

8/11/2022: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

8/11/2022: NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

REQUEST - FOR ISSUANCE

8/11/2022: REQUEST - FOR ISSUANCE

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - SHEA K GHERING

8/12/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - SHEA K GHERING

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2022072097

8/12/2022: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2022072097

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

8/23/2022: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

SUMMONS SERVED - SHEA K GHERING

8/25/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - SHEA K GHERING

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • HearingTime: 10:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM F; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS (SOUTH COUNTY); Court Result: CANC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - SHEA K GHERING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500; Total Fee: $175.00; Amount Paid: $175.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2022072097

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - SHEA K GHERING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 08/31/2022 AT 10:00 AM IN E , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST - FOR ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOMINIC STERN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debski, Michael Thiel