This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 12/29/2022 at 15:42:47 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA VS CONNOR, GABRIELLE

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CONNOR, GABRIELLE. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Defendant

CONNOR, GABRIELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSEN, JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

11/19/2018: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

11/19/2018: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

11/19/2018: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GABRIELLE CONNOR - ISSUED 11/28/2018

11/19/2018: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GABRIELLE CONNOR - ISSUED 11/28/2018

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018116243

11/19/2018: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018116243

RESPONSE - GABRIELLE CONNOR

12/21/2018: RESPONSE - GABRIELLE CONNOR

SUMMONS SERVED - GABRIELLE CONNOR

12/24/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - GABRIELLE CONNOR

NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

3/5/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT - MEMORANDUM OF LAW

4/16/2020: MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT - MEMORANDUM OF LAW

NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

4/17/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

5/15/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION - APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

5/15/2020: MOTION - APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

ORDER - GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

5/21/2020: ORDER - GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - FROM DARLENE NORRIS

6/2/2020: CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - FROM DARLENE NORRIS

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

6/8/2020: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 5B; Description:LACK OF PROSECUTION ;Court Result:CNCL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 5B; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CANCELLED BY JACS INTERFACE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • HearingTime:10:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 5B; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - FROM DARLENE NORRIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 5B; Description:LACK OF PROSECUTION ;Court Result:Continued Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • Docket*** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jun 17 2020 1:30PM JUDGE: BOEHM, MARYANN LOCATION: JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketLACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 05/20/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN 5B , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - GABRIELLE CONNOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - GABRIELLE CONNOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018116243

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GABRIELLE CONNOR - ISSUED 11/28/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSEN, JOSEPH