This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 22:08:10 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A VS WHITE, MELANIE N

Case Summary

On 12/29/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WHITE, MELANIE N. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 SC

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A

Defendant

WHITE, MELANIE N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAVRAR, FLYNN

SPINOZZA, KEVIN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - PLAINTIFF

11/27/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - PLAINTIFF

JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018040255)

3/29/2018: JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018040255)

NOTICE OF FILING - SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT

3/21/2018: NOTICE OF FILING - SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT - MILITARY

3/21/2018: AFFIDAVIT - MILITARY

CERTIFICATE - TAXABLE COSTS

3/21/2018: CERTIFICATE - TAXABLE COSTS

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

1/31/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ORDER OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

1/31/2018: ORDER OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

SUMMONS SERVED - MELANIE N WHITE

1/25/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - MELANIE N WHITE

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- MELANIE N WHITE

1/2/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- MELANIE N WHITE

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017120697

12/29/2017: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017120697

SUMMONS- PROPOSED- MELANIE N WHITE

12/29/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED- MELANIE N WHITE

NOTICE- OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

12/29/2017: NOTICE- OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

12/29/2017: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

12/29/2017: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018040255)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - TAXABLE COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - MELANIE N WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- MELANIE N WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 01/31/2018 AT 9:00 AM IN H , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017120697

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED- MELANIE N WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less