This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/23/2022 at 18:34:25 (UTC).

CANNIZZARO, GAETANO Et Al VS STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 CANNIZZARO, GAETANO filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRUNING, KEVIN R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRUNING, KEVIN R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CANNIZZARO, GAETANO

CANNIZZARO, GRAZIA

Defendant

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHWARTZ, JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/25/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/25/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 11/29/2022

11/25/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 11/29/2022

NOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

11/25/2022: NOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/25/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/25/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022105060

11/29/2022: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022105060

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

12/6/2022: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • HearingTime: 02:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 03/21/2023 AT 2:30 PM IN 6C , JDG: BRUNING, KEVIN R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $410.00; Amount Paid: $410.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022105060

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 11/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Florida Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONATHAN SCHWARTZ