This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/25/2022 at 18:01:59 (UTC).

CALIBER HOME LOANS INC VS BAMBEY, DAVID Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 CALIBER HOME LOANS INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BAMBEY, DAVID. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIBER HOME LOANS INC

Defendants

BAMBEY, DAVID

BAMBEY, DAVID A

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DAVID A BAMBEY AKA DAVID BAMBEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE - OF VALUE

7/27/2022: NOTICE - OF VALUE

LIS PENDENS-RECORDED

7/27/2022: LIS PENDENS-RECORDED

CERTIFICATE - ORIGINAL NOTE

7/27/2022: CERTIFICATE - ORIGINAL NOTE

COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

7/27/2022: COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DAVID A BAMBEY AKA DAVID BAMBEY

7/27/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DAVID A BAMBEY AKA DAVID BAMBEY

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DAVID A BAMBEY AKA DAVID BAMBEY

7/27/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DAVID A BAMBEY AKA DAVID BAMBEY

PAYMENT $925.00 RECEIPT #2022066546

7/27/2022: PAYMENT $925.00 RECEIPT #2022066546

ORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

8/2/2022: ORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

CERTIFICATE - SERVICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING

8/8/2022: CERTIFICATE - SERVICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING

SUMMONS SERVED - DAVID A BAMBEY A/K/A DAVID BAMBEY

8/10/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - DAVID A BAMBEY A/K/A DAVID BAMBEY

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DAVID A BAMBEY AKA DAVID BAMBEY

8/11/2022: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DAVID A BAMBEY AKA DAVID BAMBEY

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

8/12/2022: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

8/12/2022: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 7C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT; Court Result: CNCL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022136103)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DAVID A BAMBEY AKA DAVID BAMBEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - DAVID A BAMBEY A/K/A DAVID BAMBEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - SERVICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 12/19/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN 7C , JDG: WALKER, STEPHEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $925.00; Amount Paid: $925.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99; Total Fee: $905.00; Amount Paid: $905.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $925.00 RECEIPT #2022066546

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DAVID A BAMBEY AKA DAVID BAMBEY - ISSUED 7/28/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DAVID A BAMBEY AKA DAVID BAMBEY - ISSUED 7/28/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS-RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022125609)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Caliber Home Loans, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan