This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/27/2021 at 13:34:30 (UTC).

CACH LLC VS BELLE, GARY E

Case Summary

On 01/14/2014 CACH LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BELLE, GARY E. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH LLC

Defendant

BELLE, GARY E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCCLURE, ALEX

SCHERR, HAROLD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

1/14/2014: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/14/2014: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GARY E BELLE - ISSUED

1/14/2014: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GARY E BELLE - ISSUED

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

1/14/2014: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014005076

1/14/2014: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014005076

SUMMONS SERVED - GARY E BELLE

2/6/2014: SUMMONS SERVED - GARY E BELLE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - GARY E BELLE

8/25/2014: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - GARY E BELLE

DEFAULT PROPOSED - GARY E BELLE

8/25/2014: DEFAULT PROPOSED - GARY E BELLE

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

8/25/2014: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT- MILITARY STATUS

8/25/2014: AFFIDAVIT- MILITARY STATUS

AFFIDAVIT-COSTS

8/25/2014: AFFIDAVIT-COSTS

DEFAULT -- GARY E BELLE

8/26/2014: DEFAULT -- GARY E BELLE

JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2014104357)

9/2/2014: JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2014104357)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2014104357)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT -- GARY E BELLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT- MILITARY STATUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT PROPOSED - GARY E BELLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - GARY E BELLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - GARY E BELLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014005076

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE ASSESSED $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GARY E BELLE - ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/14/2014 CASE NUMBER 2014 CC 000183 NC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CACH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCLURE, ALEX

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHERR, HAROLD EARL