This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/05/2022 at 18:00:54 (UTC).

BYERS, ADAM KENT VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 BYERS, ADAM KENT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BYERS, ADAM KENT

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGH, NATALIA

Defendant Attorneys

MITCHELL, CHARLES PENDLETON

GUILLAUME, REGINALD

MITCHELL, CHARLES

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/4/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GENERAL MOTORS LLC - ISSUED 01/04/2022

1/4/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GENERAL MOTORS LLC - ISSUED 01/04/2022

COMPLAINT

1/4/2022: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

1/4/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

1/4/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

1/4/2022: NOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022000850

1/4/2022: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022000850

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

1/10/2022: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

1/11/2022: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

1/27/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 7C; Description:CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 06/06/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN 7C , JDG: WALKER, STEPHEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$410.00; Amount Paid:$410.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022000850

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GENERAL MOTORS LLC - ISSUED 01/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REGINALD GUILLAUME

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHARLES MITCHELL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MITCHELL, CHARLES PENDLETON