This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/02/2021 at 19:21:38 (UTC).

BUTERBAUGH, NOEL VS CARVER, BENJAMIN Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2014 BUTERBAUGH, NOEL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CARVER, BENJAMIN. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUTERBAUGH, NOEL

Defendants

CARVER, BENJAMIN

CARVER, EVANTHIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GUARNIERI, DANIEL

STEWART, JESSICA

Defendant Attorney

MCKILLOP, DANIEL

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF HEARING

9/28/2015: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF HEARING

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF HEARING

3/31/2015: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER - PROPOSED - REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

1/28/2015: ORDER - PROPOSED - REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

3/5/2015: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/22/2014: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

10/16/2015: NOTICE OF MEDIATION

DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

8/18/2015: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE (ORIGINAL)

7/20/2015: NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE (ORIGINAL)

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

4/15/2015: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • HearingTime:09:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7C; Description:ORDER OF CASE MANGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDED ORDER OF MAGISTRATE ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECOMMENDED ORDER OF MAGISTRATE ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • HearingTime:02:00 PM; Location:COURTROOM 1; Description:MOTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • DocketORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 11/24/2015 AT 9:30 AM IN 7C , JDG: CURLEY, ROCHELLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Oct 20 2015 2:00PM JUDGE: BAILEY, DEBORAH LOCATION: JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - JUDICIAL DEFAULT - BENJAMIN CARVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - EVANTHIA CARVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - BENJAMIN CARVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$410.00; Amount Paid:$410.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2014095889

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BENJAMIN CARVER - ISSUED 8/22/14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEWART, JESSICA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUARNIERI, DANIEL