This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/05/2022 at 18:05:52 (UTC).

BURCHARDS, HARRY Et Al VS KRUSE, JEFFREY LANCE Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 BURCHARDS, HARRY filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against KRUSE, JEFFREY LANCE. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Counter Defendants and Plaintiffs

BURCHARDS, HARRY

SUEANN SANDERS AS PLENARY GUARDIAN OF THE PERSON AND PROPERTY OF HARRY M BURCHARDS JR

Defendants

KRUSE, JEFFREY LANCE

UNKNOWN PERSON IN POSSESSION 1

UNKNOWN PERSON IN POSSESSION 2

Counter Plaintiff

JEFFREY LANCE KRUSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

MCKAY, SCOTT

AKER, E

EISEMANN, DEREK

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - COUNTERCLAIM

5/31/2022: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - COUNTERCLAIM

NOTICE - OF WITHDRAWAL OF ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

5/31/2022: NOTICE - OF WITHDRAWAL OF ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF FILING

5/27/2022: NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE OF FILING - ORDER

5/27/2022: NOTICE OF FILING - ORDER

MEMORANDUM - OF LAW

5/18/2022: MEMORANDUM - OF LAW

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

5/19/2022: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF HEARING

5/19/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

PAYMENT $105.00 REFUND $190.00 RECEIPT #2022044903

5/19/2022: PAYMENT $105.00 REFUND $190.00 RECEIPT #2022044903

PAYMENT $295.00 RECEIPT #2022044900

5/19/2022: PAYMENT $295.00 RECEIPT #2022044900

RECEIPT # 2022044888 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00

5/19/2022: RECEIPT # 2022044888 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00

PAYMENT $295.00 RECEIPT #2022044888 - FROM 2021CC004949NC

5/19/2022: PAYMENT $295.00 RECEIPT #2022044888 - FROM 2021CC004949NC

RESPONSE - TO REQUEST FOR EMERGENCY HEARING AND/OR CLARIFICATION

5/18/2022: RESPONSE - TO REQUEST FOR EMERGENCY HEARING AND/OR CLARIFICATION

RESPONSE - ORDER RESETTING TRIAL AND REQUESTS FOR EMERGENCY HEARING AND/OR FOR CLARIFICATION

5/18/2022: RESPONSE - ORDER RESETTING TRIAL AND REQUESTS FOR EMERGENCY HEARING AND/OR FOR CLARIFICATION

ORDER SETTING TRIAL - RESETTING

5/18/2022: ORDER SETTING TRIAL - RESETTING

ORDER - CANCELLING TRIAL UNTIL DETERMINATION OF CAPACITY BY CIRCUIT COURT

5/16/2022: ORDER - CANCELLING TRIAL UNTIL DETERMINATION OF CAPACITY BY CIRCUIT COURT

MEMORANDUM - LAW

5/16/2022: MEMORANDUM - LAW

NOTICE - OF RULING IN RELATED CASE AND REQUEST FOR EMERGENCY HEARING

5/13/2022: NOTICE - OF RULING IN RELATED CASE AND REQUEST FOR EMERGENCY HEARING

ORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

5/10/2022: ORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 7C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT; Court Result: CANC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL - COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF WITHDRAWAL OF ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 5B; Description: NON-JURY TRIAL - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $105.00 REFUND $190.00 RECEIPT #2022044903

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $295.00 RECEIPT #2022044900

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $295.00 RECEIPT #2022019089

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM SCOTT D MCKAY, ESQUIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - MOTION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST - JUDICIAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NEIL W SCOTT ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - JEFFREY LANCE KRUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTER - COUNTY - JEFFREY LANCE KRUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AKER, E

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCKAY, SCOTT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EISEMANN, DEREK WILLIAM