This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 10:17:31 (UTC).

BULLDOG RESTORATION LLC VS SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/30/2017 BULLDOG RESTORATION LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BULLDOG RESTORATION LLC

Defendant

SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINEO, PETER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE - OF UNAVAILABILITY

1/28/2020: NOTICE - OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE - OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

12/30/2019: NOTICE - OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

OBJECTION - NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

2/21/2019: OBJECTION - NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME

2/19/2019: MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

1/24/2019: NOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

1/24/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

1/24/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

1/24/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

1/24/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME

11/6/2017: MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION - TO DISMISS

10/11/2017: MOTION - TO DISMISS

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017083951

8/30/2017: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017083951

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY-ISSUED 09/05/2017

8/30/2017: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY-ISSUED 09/05/2017

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

8/30/2017: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

8/30/2017: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

8/30/2017: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

8/30/2017: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/30/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION - NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017083951

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY-ISSUED 09/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less