This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 10/01/2021 at 17:32:08 (UTC).

BUHL, GUNTRAM

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 BUHL, GUNTRAM was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUHL, GUNTRAM

Defendant

GALLOWAY, JOSHUA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NOWICKI, KRISTOPHER

TAYLOR, ZACHARY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

9/28/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021079766

9/17/2021: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021079766

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JOSHUA GALLOWAY

9/17/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JOSHUA GALLOWAY

COMPLAINT

9/17/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/17/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$410.00; Amount Paid:$410.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021079766

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JOSHUA GALLOWAY - ISSUED 9/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRISTOPHER M NOWICKI