This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 06/06/2022 at 18:30:41 (UTC).

BRW CONTRACTING INC VS WESTERN SURETY COMPANY Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 BRW CONTRACTING INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WESTERN SURETY COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 SC

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRW CONTRACTING INC

Defendants

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY

Winter Park Construction

WPC III INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACHNIK, SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

NORMAN, TODD KEITH

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/13/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- WESTERN SURETYY COMPANY

5/13/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- WESTERN SURETYY COMPANY

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- WPC III INC DBA WINTER PARK CONSTRUCTION

5/13/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- WPC III INC DBA WINTER PARK CONSTRUCTION

COMPLAINT

5/13/2022: COMPLAINT

EXHIBIT- A- SUBCONTRACT AGREEMENT

5/13/2022: EXHIBIT- A- SUBCONTRACT AGREEMENT

EXHIBIT- B- NOTICE TO OWNER

5/13/2022: EXHIBIT- B- NOTICE TO OWNER

EXHIBIT- C- CLAIM OF LIEN

5/13/2022: EXHIBIT- C- CLAIM OF LIEN

EXHIBIT- D

5/13/2022: EXHIBIT- D

EXHIBIT- E- CERTIFICATE OF TRANSFER LIEN TO BOND

5/13/2022: EXHIBIT- E- CERTIFICATE OF TRANSFER LIEN TO BOND

PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2022043371

5/13/2022: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2022043371

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

5/16/2022: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

NOTICE OF FILING - RETURN OF SERVICE

5/19/2022: NOTICE OF FILING - RETURN OF SERVICE

EXHIBIT - A

5/19/2022: EXHIBIT - A

NOTICE OF FILING - RETURN OF SERVICE

5/23/2022: NOTICE OF FILING - RETURN OF SERVICE

SUMMONS SERVED - WPC III D/B/A WINTER PARK CONSTRUCTION

5/23/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - WPC III D/B/A WINTER PARK CONSTRUCTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY EMAIL ADDRESSES

6/3/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY EMAIL ADDRESSES

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM D; Description:CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - WPC III D/B/A WINTER PARK CONSTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT - A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 09/09/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN D , JDG: CARROLL, HUNTER W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$420.00; Amount Paid:$420.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2022043371

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT- E- CERTIFICATE OF TRANSFER LIEN TO BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT- D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT- C- CLAIM OF LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT- B- NOTICE TO OWNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT- A- SUBCONTRACT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- WPC III INC DBA WINTER PARK CONSTRUCTION - ISSUED 5/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- WESTERN SURETY COMPANY - ISSUED 5/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WPC III INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WINTER PARK CONSTRUCTION CO AKA is a litigant

Latest cases where BRW CONTRACTING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant