This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 03/15/2023 at 00:43:43 (UTC).

BRUNER, CHELSEA Et Al VS LAM, HOANG B Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 BRUNER, CHELSEA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LAM, HOANG B. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRUNER, CHELSEA

CACHIA, JEFFREY

3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Defendants

TRAN, LONG Q

LAM, HOANG B

3Rd Party Defendants

LUU, HOA NAP

PHAM, ANH LOAN THI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGG MARTIN HOROWITZ

3Rd Party Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

SIMONSON, HANNA

3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

MORRISON, CHRISTOPHER CECIL

 

Court Documents

MOTION - EXTENSION TIME

3/9/2023: MOTION - EXTENSION TIME

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

3/8/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

3/8/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS SERVED - HOA NAP LUU

2/24/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - HOA NAP LUU

SUMMONS SERVED - ANH LOAN THI PHAM

2/24/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - ANH LOAN THI PHAM

MOTION - STRIKE DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

2/16/2023: MOTION - STRIKE DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

PAYMENT $315.00 RECEIPT #2023014503

2/15/2023: PAYMENT $315.00 RECEIPT #2023014503

COMPLAINT - THIRD PARTY - COUNTY

2/14/2023: COMPLAINT - THIRD PARTY - COUNTY

SUMMONS PLURIES COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ISSUED 02/16/2023

2/14/2023: SUMMONS PLURIES COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ISSUED 02/16/2023

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - EXTENSION TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - HOA NAP LUU

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - ANH LOAN THI PHAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - STRIKE DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $315.00 RECEIPT #2023014503

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - THIRD PARTY - COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS PLURIES COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ISSUED 02/16/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS PLURIES COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ISSUED 02/16/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT - THIRD PARTY - COUNTY; Total Fee: $295.00; Amount Paid: $295.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2022113325

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - LONG Q TRAN - ISSUED 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - HOANG B LAM - ISSUED 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less