This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/20/2022 at 02:09:43 (UTC).

BROOKS, CHRISTINA, PEFFER, ELAINE Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/11/2022 BROOKS, CHRISTINA, PEFFER, ELAINE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, CHARLES E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, CHARLES E

 

Party Details

Decedent

PEFFER, ELAINE

Applicant

BROOKS, CHRISTINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

FERRARI, JOHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketINVENTORY - NO FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketWAIVER - OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - HCA FLORIDA SARASOTA DOCTORS HOSPITAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022125412)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketBOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE (BOND REQUIRED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketWILL ADMITTED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022122082)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketACTION: PROPOSED ORDER FORWARDED TO JUDGE'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2022061322

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE - PUBLIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketORDER - PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketOATH - OF WITNESS TO WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN LOUIS FERRARI JR