This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/09/2021 at 16:58:20 (UTC).

BRETZ CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/01/2017 BRETZ CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRETZ CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENBERG, H

Defendant Attorneys

OXENDINE, ROBERT H

OXENDINE, ROBERT

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST FOR ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST TO PRODUCE

1/18/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST FOR ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST TO PRODUCE

MOTION - PLAINTIFF - FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

11/9/2017: MOTION - PLAINTIFF - FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY DEMANDS

10/11/2017: NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY DEMANDS

PLAINTIFFS REPLY AND MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/10/2017: PLAINTIFFS REPLY AND MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

10/9/2017: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC ADDRESS

10/9/2017: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC ADDRESS

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

9/26/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF FILING - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

9/7/2017: NOTICE OF FILING - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS- PROPOSED- STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

9/1/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED- STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

2/13/2018: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM

2/6/2018: MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM

DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

10/9/2017: DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

9/30/2017: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

PIP CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

9/26/2017: PIP CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/CANCELLATION OD SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

9/18/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/CANCELLATION OD SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017084885

9/1/2017: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017084885

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

9/1/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

9/1/2017: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVING MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEY'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST FOR ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - PLAINTIFF - FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY DEMANDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REPLY AND MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPIP CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE/CANCELLATION OD SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017084885

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 09/26/2017 AT 10:30 AM IN 5C , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED- STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRETZ CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENBERG, H