This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 12:18:18 (UTC).

BRETZ CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC Et Al VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/02/2018 BRETZ CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRETZ CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC

TREBILCOCK, RICK

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMICK, PHILIP

Defendant Attorney

SALOMON, GIBELLE

 

Court Documents

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

12/4/2019: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE - OF UNAVAILABILITY

12/2/2019: NOTICE - OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE - OF UNAVAILABILITY

12/2/2019: NOTICE - OF UNAVAILABILITY

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/15/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/15/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/15/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

10/4/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

DISCLOSURE

5/24/2018: DISCLOSURE

ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

5/24/2018: ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

MOTION - ENLARGMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND

5/11/2018: MOTION - ENLARGMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL

5/11/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018033909

4/2/2018: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018033909

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 04/03/2018

4/2/2018: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 04/03/2018

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

4/2/2018: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 5B; Description:LACK OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketLACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 12/04/2019 AT 1:30 PM IN 5B , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - ENLARGMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE & EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018033909

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 04/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less