This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/18/2020 at 04:34:07 (UTC).

BOWMAN, LORETTA KAY, BOWMAN, LORETTA KAY Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/07/2018 BOWMAN, LORETTA KAY, BOWMAN, LORETTA KAY was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

BOWMAN, LORETTA KAY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketPAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2018109450

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketJUDGMENT - NAME CHANGE -RECORDED -AMENDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018142991)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketACTION: SUBMITTED NAME CHANGE TO FDLE- NC-30008044

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM J; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • DocketPAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2018101415

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • DocketJUDGMENT - NAME CHANGE -RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018132967)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Oct 8 2018 9:00AM JUDGE: BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FORM A LORETTA BOWMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULES OF COURTROOM ETIQUETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCLOSURE FROM NONLAWYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketREPORT NAME CHANGE REPORT OF FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketPAYMENT $403.50 RECEIPT #2018091102

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR NAME CHANGE (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less