This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 12:50:51 (UTC).

BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/26/2017 BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARAK, ANTHONY

Defendant Attorney

BERMUDEZ, D

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

11/15/2017: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

11/13/2017: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/10/2017: RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF FILING-INTERROGATORIES-PLAINTIFF

10/31/2017: NOTICE OF FILING-INTERROGATORIES-PLAINTIFF

CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC-FROM BARAK LAW GROUP

10/31/2017: CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC-FROM BARAK LAW GROUP

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION-PLAINTIFF'S FIRST

10/31/2017: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION-PLAINTIFF'S FIRST

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/31/2017: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

10/24/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ORDER - PIP CASE MANAGEMENT

10/24/2017: ORDER - PIP CASE MANAGEMENT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - FOR DEFENDANT

10/20/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - FOR DEFENDANT

PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017090776

9/26/2017: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017090776

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

9/26/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

9/26/2017: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

9/26/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

9/26/2017: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING-INTERROGATORIES-PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC-FROM BARAK LAW GROUP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION-PLAINTIFF'S FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • HearingTime:10:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 5C; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PIP CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$65.00; Amount Paid:$65.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017090776

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 10/24/2017 AT 10:30 AM IN 5C , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less