This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 12/24/2022 at 19:13:24 (UTC).

BOLAM, RICHARD VS RICKER, TIM

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 BOLAM, RICHARD filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against RICKER, TIM. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOLAM, RICHARD

Defendant

RICKER, TIM

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED - TIM RICKER - HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

11/29/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - TIM RICKER - HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2022104892

11/29/2022: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2022104892

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

11/29/2022: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

CONSENT TO CLOSE CASE HAS BEEN FILED

11/29/2022: CONSENT TO CLOSE CASE HAS BEEN FILED

SUMMONS SERVED - TIM RICKER

12/2/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - TIM RICKER

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - TIM RICKER

12/12/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - TIM RICKER

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION

12/14/2022: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION

RESPONSE - EVICTION RESPONSE - TIMOTHY RICKER

12/22/2022: RESPONSE - EVICTION RESPONSE - TIMOTHY RICKER

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketACTION: EVICTION RESPONSE EMAILED TO JUDGES OFFICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - EVICTION RESPONSE - TIMOTHY RICKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketACTION: CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT - NO CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED - TIM RICKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - TIM RICKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - TIM RICKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $195.00; Amount Paid: $195.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION; Total Fee: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CLOSE CASE HAS BEEN FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2022104892

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - TIM RICKER - HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less