This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/19/2020 at 05:26:29 (UTC).

BERMUDEZ RODRIGUEZ, SALVADOR, COOK, RENEE Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2019 BERMUDEZ RODRIGUEZ, SALVADOR, COOK, RENEE was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MANATEE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendants

BERMUDEZ RODRIGUEZ, SALVADOR

COOK, RENEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AVRUTIS, THOMAS

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS SERVED - SALVADOR BERMUDEZ RODRIGUEZ

6/6/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - SALVADOR BERMUDEZ RODRIGUEZ

SUMMONS SERVED - RENEE COOK

6/6/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - RENEE COOK

PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #2019050457

5/20/2019: PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #2019050457

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- RENEE COOK - ISSUED 05/20/2019

5/20/2019: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- RENEE COOK - ISSUED 05/20/2019

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SALVADOR BERMUDEZ RODRIGUEZ - ISSUED 05/20/2019

5/20/2019: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SALVADOR BERMUDEZ RODRIGUEZ - ISSUED 05/20/2019

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

5/20/2019: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/20/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

INFORMATION SHEET - RENEE TASHA COOK AND SALVADOR BERMUDEZ RODRIGUEZ

12/16/2019: INFORMATION SHEET - RENEE TASHA COOK AND SALVADOR BERMUDEZ RODRIGUEZ

NOTICE - OF MAILING

11/26/2019: NOTICE - OF MAILING

JUDGMENT - RECORDED - DEFAULT - Recorded (OR. / 2019150385)

10/31/2019: JUDGMENT - RECORDED - DEFAULT - Recorded (OR. / 2019150385)

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

10/31/2019: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

AFFIDAVIT - IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT & DAMAGES

8/30/2019: AFFIDAVIT - IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT & DAMAGES

AFFIDAVIT - REGARDING ATTORNEYS FE

8/30/2019: AFFIDAVIT - REGARDING ATTORNEYS FE

AFFIDAVIT - OF TIME SPENT

8/30/2019: AFFIDAVIT - OF TIME SPENT

MOTION - FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES

8/30/2019: MOTION - FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES

DEFAULT - SALVADOR BERMUDEZ RODRIGUEZ - RENEE COOK

6/18/2019: DEFAULT - SALVADOR BERMUDEZ RODRIGUEZ - RENEE COOK

AFFIDAVIT - AS TO PROPER VENUE AND MILITARY STATUS

6/17/2019: AFFIDAVIT - AS TO PROPER VENUE AND MILITARY STATUS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - SALVADOR BERMUDEZ RODRIGUEZ AND RENEE COOK

6/17/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - SALVADOR BERMUDEZ RODRIGUEZ AND RENEE COOK

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION SHEET - RENEE TASHA COOK AND SALVADOR BERMUDEZ RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • HearingTime:02:00 PM; Location:COURTROOM 5B; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - DEFAULT - Recorded (OR. / 2019150385)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • HearingTime:09:45 AM; Location:COURTROOM 5B; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CANCELLED BY JACS INTERFACE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Oct 31 2019 2:00PM JUDGE: BOEHM, MARYANN LOCATION: 5B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Docket*** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Oct 28 2019 9:45AM JUDGE: BOEHM, MARYANN LOCATION: 5B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Oct 28 2019 9:45AM JUDGE: BOEHM, MARYANN LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - AS TO PROPER VENUE AND MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - SALVADOR BERMUDEZ RODRIGUEZ AND RENEE COOK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - SALVADOR BERMUDEZ RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - RENEE COOK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$320.00; Amount Paid:$320.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #2019050457

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- RENEE COOK - ISSUED 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SALVADOR BERMUDEZ RODRIGUEZ - ISSUED 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less