This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/24/2021 at 15:38:29 (UTC).

BELFIORE FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST UA DECEMBER 19 2011 VS ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS OR ENTITIES IN POSSESSION OR USE Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 BELFIORE FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST UA DECEMBER 19 2011 filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS OR ENTITIES IN POSSESSION OR USE. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, STEPHEN and RUHL, MARIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 SC

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, STEPHEN

RUHL, MARIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELFIORE FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST UA DECEMBER 19 2011

Defendants

ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS OR ENTITIES IN POSSESSION OR USE

CALDERON, PAMELA T

PAMELA T CALDERON P A

ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSON(S) OR ENTITIES IN POSSESSION OR USE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUMMONTE, JOSEPH FRANK JR

 

Court Documents

WRIT RETURNED - POSSESSION - POSTED/POSSESSION

2/5/2020: WRIT RETURNED - POSSESSION - POSTED/POSSESSION

WRIT ISSUED - POSSESSION

1/16/2020: WRIT ISSUED - POSSESSION

WRIT PROPOSED - POSSESSION

1/16/2020: WRIT PROPOSED - POSSESSION

ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT

1/14/2020: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT

1/14/2020: STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT

JUDGMENT - RECORDED - POSSESSION - Recorded (OR. / 2020005064)

1/13/2020: JUDGMENT - RECORDED - POSSESSION - Recorded (OR. / 2020005064)

MOTION - FINAL JUDGMENT POSSESSION

1/10/2020: MOTION - FINAL JUDGMENT POSSESSION

DEFAULT- ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSON(S) OR ENTITIES IN POSSESSION OR USE

1/3/2020: DEFAULT- ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSON(S) OR ENTITIES IN POSSESSION OR USE

DEFAULT - PAMELA T CALDERON PA

1/3/2020: DEFAULT - PAMELA T CALDERON PA

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION

12/20/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION

PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2019125268

12/17/2019: PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2019125268

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

12/17/2019: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS OR ENTITIES IN POSSESSION OR USE R - 12/17/2019

12/17/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS OR ENTITIES IN POSSESSION OR USE R - 12/17/2019

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PAMELA TCALDERON 12/17/2019

12/17/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PAMELA TCALDERON 12/17/2019

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- PAMELA T CALDETON PA - ISSUED 12/17/2019

12/17/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- PAMELA T CALDETON PA - ISSUED 12/17/2019

NOTICE OF SOUTH COUNTY ORIGIN

12/17/2019: NOTICE OF SOUTH COUNTY ORIGIN

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/17/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/17/2019: COMPLAINT

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED - POSSESSION - POSTED/POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED - POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT PROPOSED - POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - POSSESSION - Recorded (OR. / 2020005064)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FINAL JUDGMENT POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT- ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSON(S) OR ENTITIES IN POSSESSION OR USE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - PAMELA T CALDERON PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - PAMELA T CALDERON

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$430.00; Amount Paid:$430.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2019125268

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS OR ENTITIES IN POSSESSION OR USE R - 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PAMELA TCALDERON 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- PAMELA T CALDETON PA - ISSUED 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOUTH COUNTY ORIGIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUMMONTE, JOSEPH FRANK JR