Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/21/2021 at 19:39:53 (UTC).

BEALL'S OUTLET STORES INC, BEALL'S STORES INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2019 BEALL'S OUTLET STORES INC, BEALL'S STORES INC was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMARA, EUGENE

Defendants and Cross Defendants

IA SARASOTA TAMIAMI LLC

BEALL'S WESTGATE CORPORATION

BEALL'S STORES INC

BONEL BUILDING CORP INC

INVENTRUST PROPERTIES CORP

BEALL'S OUTLET STORES INC

BEALLS INC

INVENTRUST PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC

Cross Plaintiffs

IA SARASOTA LLC

INVENTRUST MANAGEMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KETCHUM, LINDSAY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MURPHY, MICHAEL

PETRILLO, ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS SERVED - INVESTRUST PROPERTIES

6/21/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - INVESTRUST PROPERTIES

SUMMONS SERVED - BEALL'S OUTLET STORE, INC

6/7/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - BEALL'S OUTLET STORE, INC

SUMMONS SERVED - BEALL'S INC

6/7/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - BEALL'S INC

SUMMONS SERVED - BEALL'S INC

6/7/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - BEALL'S INC

PAYMENT $480.00 RECEIPT #2019054659

5/31/2019: PAYMENT $480.00 RECEIPT #2019054659

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - INVENTRUST PROPERTY MANAGEMENT- ISSUED 05/31/2019

5/31/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - INVENTRUST PROPERTY MANAGEMENT- ISSUED 05/31/2019

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - INVESTRUST PROPERTIES- ISSUED 05/31/2019

5/31/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - INVESTRUST PROPERTIES- ISSUED 05/31/2019

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BEALLS OUTLET STORES- ISSUED 05/31/2019

5/31/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BEALLS OUTLET STORES- ISSUED 05/31/2019

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/31/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE - OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES

10/5/2020: NOTICE - OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES

RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

8/14/2020: RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

MOTION - DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED

7/31/2020: MOTION - DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED

NOTICE OF SERVING - INTERROGATORIES

6/11/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING - INTERROGATORIES

INFORMATION SHEET

2/19/2020: INFORMATION SHEET

ORDER - ADOPTING RECOMMENDED ORDER

11/8/2019: ORDER - ADOPTING RECOMMENDED ORDER

NOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED

10/22/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED

NOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO INVENTRUST PROPERTIES CORP

10/9/2019: NOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO INVENTRUST PROPERTIES CORP

SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - GEICO

8/23/2019: SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - GEICO

196 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • HearingTime:11:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 1; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Nov 16 2020 11:00AM JUDGE: BAILEY, DEBORAH LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION - HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE- OF AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - OF NON OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Nov 16 2020 11:00AM JUDGE: BAILEY, DEBORAH LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST - COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST - COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
214 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - INVENTRUST PROPERTY MANAGEMENT- ISSUED 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - INVESTRUST PROPERTIES- ISSUED 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - IA SARASOTA TAMIAMI- ISSUED 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BONEL BUILDING CORP- ISSUED 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BEALLS WESTGATE CORPORATION- ISSUED 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BEALLS STORES INC- ISSUED 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BEALLS OUTLET STORES- ISSUED 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BEALLS INC- ISSUED 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IA SARASOTA TAMIAMI LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BEALL'S STORES, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bonel Building Corp Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where BEALLS OUTLET STORES INC is a litigant