Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/14/2021 at 12:27:11 (UTC).

BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC VS ALBRECHT JUNG JR AS CO TRUSTEE OF THE JUNG FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST DATED SEPTEMBER 23 2014 Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2018 BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ALBRECHT JUNG JR AS CO TRUSTEE OF THE JUNG FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST DATED SEPTEMBER 23 2014. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCURIO, FREDERICK P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCURIO, FREDERICK P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

Defendants

JUNG, KAREN M

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

JUNG JR, ALBRECHT

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA

ALBRECHT JUNG JR AS CO TRUSTEE OF THE JUNG FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST DATED SEPTEMBER 23 2014

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

SADDLE CREEK OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

JUNG, KAREN

KAREN M JUNG AKA KAREN JUNG AS CO TRUSTEE OF THE JUNG FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST DATED SEPTEMBER 23 2014

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRAUS, ARNOLD

Defendant Attorneys

EDWARDS, SHEREE

ROWE, MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC

8/13/2018: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC

ORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - AND CANCELLING LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR. / 2018107963)

8/13/2018: ORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - AND CANCELLING LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR. / 2018107963)

DISMISSAL - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018103616)

8/2/2018: DISMISSAL - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018103616)

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

8/2/2018: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

DISCHARGE/RELEASE LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018103622)

8/2/2018: DISCHARGE/RELEASE LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018103622)

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED AND RECORDED - UNKNOWN TENANTS #1 AND #2 - Recorded (OR. / 2018049994)

4/17/2018: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED AND RECORDED - UNKNOWN TENANTS #1 AND #2 - Recorded (OR. / 2018049994)

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT 2

4/17/2018: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT 2

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT 1

4/17/2018: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT 1

SUMMONS SERVED - KAREN M JUNG AKA KAREN JUNG AS CO TRUSTEE OF THE JUNG FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST DATED SEPTEMBER 23, 2014

4/17/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - KAREN M JUNG AKA KAREN JUNG AS CO TRUSTEE OF THE JUNG FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST DATED SEPTEMBER 23, 2014

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-KAREN M JUNG AKA KAREN JUNG - ISSUED 03/26/2018

3/26/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-KAREN M JUNG AKA KAREN JUNG - ISSUED 03/26/2018

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-ALBRECHT JUNG JR - ISSUED 03/26/2018

3/26/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-ALBRECHT JUNG JR - ISSUED 03/26/2018

CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

3/26/2018: CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

3/26/2018: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018038357)

3/26/2018: LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018038357)

COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

3/26/2018: COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/26/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF VALUE

3/26/2018: NOTICE OF VALUE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/26/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - AND CANCELLING LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR. / 2018107963)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018103616)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCHARGE/RELEASE LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018103622)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED AND RECORDED - UNKNOWN TENANTS #1 AND #2 - Recorded (OR. / 2018049994)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - KAREN M JUNG AKA KAREN JUNG AS CO TRUSTEE OF THE JUNG FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST DATED SEPTEMBER 23, 2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - KAREN M JUNG AKA KAREN JUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-UNKNOWN TENANT #1 - ISSUED 03/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-KAREN M JUNG AKA KAREN JUNG - ISSUED 03/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-ALBRECHT JUNG JR - ISSUED 03/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018038357)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SADDLE CREEK OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bayview Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDWARDS, SHEREE