This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/17/2020 at 18:41:51 (UTC).

BAYSIDE PROFESSIONAL CENTER CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC VS DIVERSIFIED UNDERGROUND SERVICES, INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/23/2018 BAYSIDE PROFESSIONAL CENTER CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC filed an Other lawsuit against DIVERSIFIED UNDERGROUND SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUHL, MARIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUHL, MARIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAYSIDE PROFESSIONAL CENTER CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SOUTHERN LIGHT LLC

DIVERSIFIED UNDERGROUND SERVICES, INC

SOUTHERN DIVERSIFIED TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

SOUTHERN DIVERSIFIED TECHNOLOGIES INC

Cross Defendants

DIVERSIFIED UNDERGROUND SERVICES INC

SOUTHERN DIVERSIFIED TECHNOLOGIES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

IACONO, VINCENT

SORRELL, BENJAMIN

SORRELL, BEN

CANNON, JAMES

YOUNT, SCOTT

LUTZ, H

VALENTINE, STEPHANIE

CAVANAUGH, DANIEL

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CANNON, JAMES

LUTZ, H

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - VOLUNTARY

11/12/2019: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - VOLUNTARY

NOTICE OF FILING - EXHIBIT A

9/25/2019: NOTICE OF FILING - EXHIBIT A

NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION - OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD

3/25/2019: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION - OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO CROSS-CLAIM - CROSS DEFENDANT

11/14/2018: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO CROSS-CLAIM - CROSS DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - SECOND AMENDED

11/13/2018: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - SECOND AMENDED

PAYMENT $395.00 RECEIPT #2018105400

10/18/2018: PAYMENT $395.00 RECEIPT #2018105400

LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

10/16/2018: LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

COMPLAINT - CROSS - CIRCUIT & ANSWER & DEFENSES - SOUTHERN DIVERSIFIED TECHNOLOGIES INC

10/16/2018: COMPLAINT - CROSS - CIRCUIT & ANSWER & DEFENSES - SOUTHERN DIVERSIFIED TECHNOLOGIES INC

CROSS-DEFENDANT MOTION TO DISMISS CROSS-PLAINTIFF CROSS-CLAIM

10/11/2018: CROSS-DEFENDANT MOTION TO DISMISS CROSS-PLAINTIFF CROSS-CLAIM

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

6/14/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

6/14/2018: MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE,DISCLOSURE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION - SOUTHERN DIVERSIFIED TECHNOLOGIES INC

6/14/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE,DISCLOSURE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION - SOUTHERN DIVERSIFIED TECHNOLOGIES INC

PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2018053678

5/23/2018: PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2018053678

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- DIVERSIFIED UNDERGROUND SERVICES INC- ISSUED 5/23/2018

5/23/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- DIVERSIFIED UNDERGROUND SERVICES INC- ISSUED 5/23/2018

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SOUTHERN DIVERSIFIED TECHNOLOGIES INC- ISSUED 5/23/2018

5/23/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SOUTHERN DIVERSIFIED TECHNOLOGIES INC- ISSUED 5/23/2018

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SOUTHERN LIGHT LLC- ISSUED 5/23/2018

5/23/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SOUTHERN LIGHT LLC- ISSUED 5/23/2018

COMPLAINT

5/23/2018: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/23/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL - VOLUNTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - EXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION - OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO CROSS-CLAIM - CROSS DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - SECOND AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $395.00 RECEIPT #2018105400

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - CROSS - CIRCUIT & ANSWER & DEFENSES - SOUTHERN DIVERSIFIED TECHNOLOGIES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS-DEFENDANT MOTION TO DISMISS CROSS-PLAINTIFF CROSS-CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS CLAIMS (PROPOSED ANSWER AND CROSS CLAIMS ATTACHED)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE,DISCLOSURE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION - SOUTHERN DIVERSIFIED TECHNOLOGIES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$1,220.00; Amount Paid:$1,220.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2018053678

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- DIVERSIFIED UNDERGROUND SERVICES INC- ISSUED 5/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SOUTHERN DIVERSIFIED TECHNOLOGIES INC- ISSUED 5/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SOUTHERN LIGHT LLC- ISSUED 5/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less