This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/19/2020 at 04:49:28 (UTC).

BAYSIDE DEVELOPMENT, BAYSIDE DEVELOPMENT & CONSTRUCTION INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2019 BAYSIDE DEVELOPMENT, BAYSIDE DEVELOPMENT CONSTRUCTION INC was filed as a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendants

BAYSIDE DEVELOPMENT

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

SCARBROUGH, KATHY

BAYSIDE DEVELOPMENT & CONSTRUCTION INC

CAPACCIONE, ANTHONY

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING CLAIMING INTEREST BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF JOHN A CAPACCIONE AKA JOHN ANTHONY CAPACCIONE DECEASED

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANTHONY J CAPACCIONE AKA ANTHONY CAPACCIONE

JOHNSON, KATHLEEN

CAPACCIONE, ANTHONY J

SOUTH GATE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

KATHLEEN JOHNSON AKA KATHY SCARBROUGH AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF JOHN A CAPACCIONE AKA JOHN ANTHONY CAPACCIONE DECEASED

KATHLEEN JOHNSON AKA KATHY SCARBROUGH

ANTHONY J CAPACCIONE AKA ANTHONY CAPACCIONE

, KATHY

, ANTHONY

BAYSIDE DEVELOPMENT & CONSTRUCTION INC DBA BAYSIDE DEVELOPMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GONZALEZ, MIGUEL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ACTION

5/23/2019: NOTICE OF ACTION

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

5/22/2019: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

SUMMONS NON SERVED - THE UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING INTEREST BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF JOHN A CAPACCIONE AKA JOHN ANTHONY CAPACCIONE DECEASED - (RETURN OF UNEXECUTED SUMMONS)

5/16/2019: SUMMONS NON SERVED - THE UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING INTEREST BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF JOHN A CAPACCIONE AKA JOHN ANTHONY CAPACCIONE DECEASED - (RETURN OF UNEXECUTED SUMMONS)

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BAYSIDE DEVELOPMENT & CONSTRUCTION INC DBA BAYSIDE DEVELOPMENT - ISSUED 05/14/2019

5/14/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BAYSIDE DEVELOPMENT & CONSTRUCTION INC DBA BAYSIDE DEVELOPMENT - ISSUED 05/14/2019

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - KATHLEEN JOHNSON AKA KATHY SCARBROUGH - ISSUED 05/14/2019

5/14/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - KATHLEEN JOHNSON AKA KATHY SCARBROUGH - ISSUED 05/14/2019

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - KATHLEEN JOHNSON AKA KATHY SCARBROUGH AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF JOHN A CAPACCIONE AKA JOHN ANTHONY CAPACCIONE DECEASED - ISSUED 05/14/2019

5/14/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - KATHLEEN JOHNSON AKA KATHY SCARBROUGH AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF JOHN A CAPACCIONE AKA JOHN ANTHONY CAPACCIONE DECEASED - ISSUED 05/14/2019

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANTHONY J CAPACCIONE AKA ANTHONY CAPACCIONE - ISSUED 05/14/2019

5/14/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANTHONY J CAPACCIONE AKA ANTHONY CAPACCIONE - ISSUED 05/14/2019

LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019062972)

5/14/2019: LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019062972)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/14/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019159160)

11/19/2019: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019159160)

FORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE TITLE PROPOSED

11/6/2019: FORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE TITLE PROPOSED

CERTIFICATE OF SALE

11/6/2019: CERTIFICATE OF SALE

PAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2019108880

10/31/2019: PAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2019108880

FORECLOSURE - NOTICE SALE PROPOSED

10/15/2019: FORECLOSURE - NOTICE SALE PROPOSED

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

10/2/2019: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY

6/28/2019: NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANTHONY J CAPACCIONE A/K/A ANTHONY CAPACCIONE

6/13/2019: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANTHONY J CAPACCIONE A/K/A ANTHONY CAPACCIONE

SUMMONS SERVED - BAYSIDE DEVELOPMENT & CONSTRUCTION, C/O DANIEL W. STOLARCZYK

6/13/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - BAYSIDE DEVELOPMENT & CONSTRUCTION, C/O DANIEL W. STOLARCZYK

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019159160)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM ONLINE; Description:JUDICIAL SALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE TITLE PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBID SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSIGNMENT OF BID - FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2019108880

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION VERIFIED FOR 11/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE - NOTICE SALE PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - KATHLEEN JOHNSON AKA KATHY SCARBROUGH - ISSUED 05/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - KATHLEEN JOHNSON AKA KATHY SCARBROUGH AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF JOHN A CAPACCIONE AKA JOHN ANTHONY CAPACCIONE DECEASED - ISSUED 05/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANTHONY J CAPACCIONE AKA ANTHONY CAPACCIONE - ISSUED 05/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ANTHONY J CAPACCIONE AKA ANTHONY CAPACCIONE - ISSUED 05/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING INTEREST BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST THE ESTATE OF JOHN A CAPACCIONE AKA JOHN ANTHONY CAPACCIONE DECEASED - ISSUED 05/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019062972)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less