This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/16/2020 at 00:57:43 (UTC).

BAYFRONT HEALTH PORT CHARLOTTE Et Al VS WILSON, JOYCE E

Case Summary

On 01/26/2018 BAYFRONT HEALTH PORT CHARLOTTE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WILSON, JOYCE E. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PORT CHARLOTTE HMA LLC

BAYFRONT HEALTH PORT CHARLOTTE

Defendant

WILSON, JOYCE E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEELE, ANTHONY JOHN

 

Court Documents

SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - JOYCE E WILSON

1/25/2019: SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - JOYCE E WILSON

SUBPOENA - TO: JOYCE WILSON

11/30/2018: SUBPOENA - TO: JOYCE WILSON

JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018069017)

5/23/2018: JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018069017)

AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILTARY AND PROPER VENUE

5/15/2018: AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILTARY AND PROPER VENUE

AFFIDAVIT - IN VERIFICATION OF CLAIM

5/15/2018: AFFIDAVIT - IN VERIFICATION OF CLAIM

AFFIDAVIT - COSTS

5/15/2018: AFFIDAVIT - COSTS

ORDER - ORDER OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

2/28/2018: ORDER - ORDER OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

2/28/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

SUMMONS SERVED - JOYCE E. WILSON

2/21/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - JOYCE E. WILSON

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018008791

1/26/2018: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018008791

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- JOYCE E WILSON

1/26/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- JOYCE E WILSON

SUMMONS- PROPOSED- JOYCE E WILSON

1/26/2018: SUMMONS- PROPOSED- JOYCE E WILSON

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

1/26/2018: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - JOYCE E WILSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA - TO: JOYCE WILSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018069017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON-MILTARY AND PROPER VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - IN VERIFICATION OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ORDER OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - JOYCE E. WILSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018008791

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- JOYCE E WILSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS (SOUTH COUNTY) SET FOR 02/28/2018 AT 9:00 AM IN H , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED- JOYCE E WILSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less