This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 11/30/2022 at 18:33:34 (UTC).

BAYFRONT HEALTH PORT CHARLOTTE Et Al VS KAUS, JOSHUA

Case Summary

On 10/01/2022 BAYFRONT HEALTH PORT CHARLOTTE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KAUS, JOSHUA. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 SC

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PORT CHARLOTTE HMA LLC

BAYFRONT HEALTH PORT CHARLOTTE

Defendant

KAUS, JOSHUA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

9/27/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

9/27/2022: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022087565

10/1/2022: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022087565

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - JOSHUA KAUS

10/3/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - JOSHUA KAUS

SUMMONS SERVED - JOSHUA KAUS

10/31/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - JOSHUA KAUS

APPEARANCE RECORD DEFAULT

11/14/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM F; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - JOSHUA KAUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - JOSHUA KAUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS (SOUTH COUNTY) SET FOR 11/09/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN F , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $310.00; Amount Paid: $310.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500; Total Fee: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022087565

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYFRONT HEALTH PORT CHARLOTTE is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT CHARLOTTE HMA LLC DBA BAY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R