This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/29/2021 at 02:13:34 (UTC).

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE VS JORDAN, MICHELLE

Case Summary

On 02/10/2014 BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JORDAN, MICHELLE. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOLDMAN, JUDITH M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 SC

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOLDMAN, JUDITH M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

Defendant

JORDAN, MICHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY, JASON

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

2/10/2014: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

2/10/2014: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MICHELLE JORDAN - ISSUED 2/10/2014

2/10/2014: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MICHELLE JORDAN - ISSUED 2/10/2014

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014016067

2/10/2014: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014016067

SUMMONS SERVED - MICHELLE JORDAN - SUB SERVED: BAILEY JORDAN

4/9/2014: SUMMONS SERVED - MICHELLE JORDAN - SUB SERVED: BAILEY JORDAN

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

4/9/2014: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

AFFIDAVIT- ANDRE

4/9/2014: AFFIDAVIT- ANDRE

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

4/9/2014: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT - OF COSTS

4/9/2014: AFFIDAVIT - OF COSTS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - MICHELLE JORDAN

4/9/2014: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - MICHELLE JORDAN

MOTION - FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

4/9/2014: MOTION - FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

DEFAULT - MICHELLE JORDAN

4/10/2014: DEFAULT - MICHELLE JORDAN

JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2014049333)

4/29/2014: JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2014049333)

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY - MICHELLE JORDAN

7/1/2014: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY - MICHELLE JORDAN

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY - MICHELLE JORDAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2014049333)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - MICHELLE JORDAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - MICHELLE JORDAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - OF COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT- ANDRE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - MICHELLE JORDAN - SUB SERVED: BAILEY JORDAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014016067

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MICHELLE JORDAN - ISSUED 2/10/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/10/2014 CASE NUMBER 2014 CC 000748 SC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Barclays Bank Delaware is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JASON DRAGUTSKY