This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/17/2020 at 22:33:53 (UTC).

BARAKAT, MOHAMED VS BOWMAN, ZACHARY Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2018 BARAKAT, MOHAMED filed an Other lawsuit against BOWMAN, ZACHARY. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARAKAT, MOHAMED

Defendants

BOWMAN, ZACHARY

Earth Works Landscape Management

GULF COAST GREENCO INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOODS, KEVIN

Defendant Attorney

WOOD, J

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

8/1/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE - OF WITHDRAWAL OF EXPERT WITNESS

7/12/2019: NOTICE - OF WITHDRAWAL OF EXPERT WITNESS

ORDER - DENYING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/9/2019: ORDER - DENYING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE - OF INTENT TO RELY UPON SUMMARY EVIDENCE

6/6/2019: NOTICE - OF INTENT TO RELY UPON SUMMARY EVIDENCE

REQUEST - PLAINTIFF SUBMIT TO EXAMINATION

5/17/2019: REQUEST - PLAINTIFF SUBMIT TO EXAMINATION

LIST - WITNESS AND EXHIBIT - PLAINTIFF

5/15/2019: LIST - WITNESS AND EXHIBIT - PLAINTIFF

MOTION - PLAINTIFF'S - FIRST THROUGH EIGHTEENTH - IN LIMINE REGARDING VARIOUS TOPICS

5/3/2019: MOTION - PLAINTIFF'S - FIRST THROUGH EIGHTEENTH - IN LIMINE REGARDING VARIOUS TOPICS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION- DUCES TECUM

12/7/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION- DUCES TECUM

RESPONSE - TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

8/14/2018: RESPONSE - TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF SERVING - AMENDED ANSWERS TO UPDATED INTERROGATORIES

7/30/2019: NOTICE OF SERVING - AMENDED ANSWERS TO UPDATED INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE - SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

6/3/2019: NOTICE - SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

6/3/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

EXHIBIT C

5/28/2019: EXHIBIT C

NOTICE - SERVING RESPONSE TO PRODUCTION REQUEST

4/16/2019: NOTICE - SERVING RESPONSE TO PRODUCTION REQUEST

NOTICE - SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

4/16/2019: NOTICE - SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY - TO AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/24/2018: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY - TO AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE - SERVING RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

9/7/2018: NOTICE - SERVING RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

7/25/2018: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

160 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2020
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6A; Description:JURY TRIAL - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • HearingTime:08:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6A; Description:MANDATORY DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • HearingTime:09:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6A; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - CIRCUIT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • HearingTime:10:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6A; Description:ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketJURY TRIAL - CIVIL SET FOR 08/24/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 6A , JDG: CARROLL, HUNTER W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketMANDATORY DOCKET SOUNDING SET FOR 08/17/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN 6A , JDG: CARROLL, HUNTER W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - CIRCUIT COURT SET FOR 07/21/2020 AT 9:30 AM IN 6A , JDG: CARROLL, HUNTER W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING TRIAL AND REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6A; Description:JURY TRIAL - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • HearingTime:08:45 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6A; Description:MANDATORY DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
181 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2018068157

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST-PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST-PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ZACHARY BOWMAN- ISSUED 7/3/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GULF COAST GREENCO INC AKA EARTH WORKS LANDSCAPE MANAGEMENT CO GARY B FRESE REGISTERED AGENT- ISSUED 7/3/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less