This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/18/2020 at 13:59:20 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY NA AS TRUSTEE FOR MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT SERIES I TRUST VS ANY AND ALL PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE HEREIN NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID U

Case Summary

On 12/20/2018 BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY NA AS TRUSTEE FOR MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT SERIES I TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANY AND ALL PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE HEREIN NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID U. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 NC

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY NA AS TRUSTEE FOR MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT SERIES I TRUST

Defendants

UNKNOWN PARTY 4 THE NAMES BEING FICTICIOUS TO ACCOUNT FOR PARTIES IN POSSESSION

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES ASSIGNEES LEINORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST DANIEL CLEM DECEASED

UNKNOWN PARTY 3

MILLER, NICOLE

WOOD, SHANTELLE

ANY AND ALL PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE HEREIN NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS

CLEM, KENNETH

HORTON, TIFFANY

CLEM, JAMES

UNKNOWN PARTY 2

UNKNOWN PARTY 1

KROUSE, SHARON

CLEM, JAMES E

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RITCHIE, JUSTIN

Defendant Attorney

RUDY, JOHN FORNEY III

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

3/20/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

DISMISSAL - VOLUNTARY AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019018004)

2/13/2019: DISMISSAL - VOLUNTARY AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019018004)

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

2/13/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

DISCLAIMER - CONDITIONAL - OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

2/13/2019: DISCLAIMER - CONDITIONAL - OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY # 1

2/7/2019: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY # 1

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY # 2

2/7/2019: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY # 2

SUMMONS SERVED - NICOLE MILLER

2/7/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - NICOLE MILLER

SUMMONS SERVED - SHARON KROUSE

2/7/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - SHARON KROUSE

SUMMONS SERVED - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

2/7/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SHANTELLE WOOD - ISSUED 12/20/2018

12/20/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SHANTELLE WOOD - ISSUED 12/20/2018

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - TIFFANY HORTON - ISSUED 12/20/2018

12/20/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - TIFFANY HORTON - ISSUED 12/20/2018

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SHARON KROUSE - ISSUED 12/20/2018

12/20/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SHARON KROUSE - ISSUED 12/20/2018

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTHING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT - ISSUED 12/20/2018

12/20/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTHING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT - ISSUED 12/20/2018

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TURSTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST DANIEL CLEM DECEASED - ISSUED 12/20/2018

12/20/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TURSTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST DANIEL CLEM DECEASED - ISSUED 12/20/2018

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN PARTY 1 -ISSUED 12/20/2018

12/20/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN PARTY 1 -ISSUED 12/20/2018

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN PARTY 2 - ISSUED 12/20/2018

12/20/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN PARTY 2 - ISSUED 12/20/2018

COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

12/20/2018: COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/20/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL - VOLUNTARY AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019018004)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCLAIMER - CONDITIONAL - OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - NICOLE MILLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - SHARON KROUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - SHANTELLE WOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - NICOLE MILLER - ISSUED 12/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SHANTELLE WOOD - ISSUED 12/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - TIFFANY HORTON - ISSUED 12/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SHARON KROUSE - ISSUED 12/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTHING THROUGH SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT - ISSUED 12/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TURSTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST DANIEL CLEM DECEASED - ISSUED 12/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN PARTY 1 -ISSUED 12/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN PARTY 2 - ISSUED 12/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less