This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/17/2021 at 02:14:13 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS TOTH, JUDITH H

Case Summary

On 10/18/2018 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TOTH, JUDITH H. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 SC

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

TOTH, JUDITH H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TURNER, LAUREN

Defendant Attorney

DELEON, SHANA

 

Court Documents

ORDER - APPROVING STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT AND DISMISSAL - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019044437)

4/8/2019: ORDER - APPROVING STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT AND DISMISSAL - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019044437)

STIPULATION - PAYMENT

4/1/2019: STIPULATION - PAYMENT

AFFIDAVIT - COSTS

2/6/2019: AFFIDAVIT - COSTS

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

2/6/2019: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT

2/6/2019: MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ANSWER - TO COMPLAINT

12/4/2018: ANSWER - TO COMPLAINT

SUMMONS SERVED - JUDITH H TOTH

11/20/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - JUDITH H TOTH

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018105450

10/18/2018: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018105450

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JUDITH H TOTH - ISSUED 10/18/2018

10/18/2018: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JUDITH H TOTH - ISSUED 10/18/2018

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

10/18/2018: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/18/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

10/18/2018: COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CANCELLED BY JACS INTERFACE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - APPROVING STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT AND DISMISSAL - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019044437)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Docket*** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: May 30 2019 1:30PM JUDGE: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N. LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: May 30 2019 1:30PM JUDGE: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N. LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER - TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - JUDITH H TOTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018105450

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JUDITH H TOTH - ISSUED 10/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less