This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 18:16:08 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS RINK, STEVEN RUSSELL

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RINK, STEVEN RUSSELL. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 SC

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

RINK, STEVEN RUSSELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STERN, DANA

Defendant Attorney

MCPHAIL, CARL

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

8/21/2018: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

SETTLEMENT STIPULATION

8/31/2017: SETTLEMENT STIPULATION

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

8/16/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT

8/16/2017: ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

7/19/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

7/19/2017: ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

6/14/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

6/14/2017: ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

5/3/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

5/3/2017: ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

5/2/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS SERVED - STEVEN RUSSELL RINK

4/20/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - STEVEN RUSSELL RINK

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017031413

3/30/2017: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017031413

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - STEVEN RUSSELL RINK - ISSUED ON 3/30/17

3/30/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - STEVEN RUSSELL RINK - ISSUED ON 3/30/17

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - STEVEN RUSSELL RINK

3/29/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - STEVEN RUSSELL RINK

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

3/29/2017: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/29/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSETTLEMENT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS (SOUTH COUNTY) SET FOR 08/16/2017 AT 9:00 AM IN H , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - STEVEN RUSSELL RINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017031413

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - STEVEN RUSSELL RINK - ISSUED ON 3/30/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS (SOUTH COUNTY) SET FOR 05/03/2017 AT 9:00 AM IN H , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - STEVEN RUSSELL RINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less