This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/12/2021 at 12:42:24 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS JOHNSON, CINDI

Case Summary

On 10/19/2017 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOHNSON, CINDI. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

JOHNSON, CINDI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WINTER, ROBERT

BERGER, KAREN

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018053853)

4/25/2018: JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018053853)

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC FROM COOLING & WINTER

4/25/2018: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC FROM COOLING & WINTER

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

4/17/2018: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

4/17/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

4/17/2018: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

DEFAULT - CINDI JOHNSON

1/26/2018: DEFAULT - CINDI JOHNSON

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

1/25/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - CINDI JOHNSON

1/25/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - CINDI JOHNSON

SUMMONS SERVED - CINDI JOHNSON

11/14/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - CINDI JOHNSON

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017098379

10/19/2017: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017098379

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

10/19/2017: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CINDI JOHNSON - ISSUED 10/19/2017

10/19/2017: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CINDI JOHNSON - ISSUED 10/19/2017

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

10/19/2017: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/19/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018053853)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC FROM COOLING & WINTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - CINDI JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - CINDI JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - CINDI JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017098379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CINDI JOHNSON - ISSUED 10/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less