This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 22:24:24 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS JACOBSON III, EARL E

Case Summary

On 01/02/2018 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JACOBSON III, EARL E. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOLDMAN, JUDITH M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOLDMAN, JUDITH M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

JACOBSON III, EARL E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VAZQUEZ, RAFAEL

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

8/16/2018: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

JUDGMENT - AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018109943)

8/16/2018: JUDGMENT - AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018109943)

STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT FOR JUDGMENT

8/6/2018: STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT FOR JUDGMENT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

5/30/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF HEARING

4/24/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

AFFIDAVIT - PROOF OF COSTS

3/1/2018: AFFIDAVIT - PROOF OF COSTS

MOTION - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

3/1/2018: MOTION - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

ANSWER - EARL E JACOBSON III

2/21/2018: ANSWER - EARL E JACOBSON III

DEFAULT

2/21/2018: DEFAULT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

2/20/2018: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

DEFAULT-PROPOSED

2/20/2018: DEFAULT-PROPOSED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - EARL E JACOBSON III

2/20/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - EARL E JACOBSON III

SUMMONS SERVED - EARL E JACOBSON III

1/29/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - EARL E JACOBSON III

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018000416

1/2/2018: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018000416

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-EARL E JACOBSON III - ISSUED 01/02/2018

12/29/2017: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-EARL E JACOBSON III - ISSUED 01/02/2018

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

12/29/2017: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/29/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018109943)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • HearingTime:01:45 PM; Location:COURTROOM 2B; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: May 30 2018 1:45PM JUDGE: GOLDMAN, JUDITH M LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - PROOF OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER - EARL E JACOBSON III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT-PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - EARL E JACOBSON III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - EARL E JACOBSON III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018000416

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-EARL E JACOBSON III - ISSUED 01/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less