This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 03/21/2023 at 18:06:49 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS DANIELS, DASHIKA D

Case Summary

On 01/20/2023 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DANIELS, DASHIKA D. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

DANIELS, DASHIKA D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KUNDAWALA, JOY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/19/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

1/19/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

1/19/2023: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

NOTICE - OF LEAD COUNSEL OF RECORD

1/19/2023: NOTICE - OF LEAD COUNSEL OF RECORD

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - DASHIKA D DANIELS

1/20/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - DASHIKA D DANIELS

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023006271

1/20/2023: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023006271

SUMMONS NON SERVED - DASHIKA D DANIELS

2/6/2023: SUMMONS NON SERVED - DASHIKA D DANIELS

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

2/7/2023: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

MAIL RETURNED - DASHIKA D DANIELS

3/13/2023: MAIL RETURNED - DASHIKA D DANIELS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED - DASHIKA D DANIELS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 2; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - DASHIKA D DANIELS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $310.00; Amount Paid: $310.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500; Total Fee: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023006271

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - DASHIKA D DANIELS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 02/07/2023 AT 9:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: COUNTY CIVIL C AND D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF LEAD COUNSEL OF RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less