This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/15/2021 at 18:35:18 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS COLLINS, KATHLEEN M

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against COLLINS, KATHLEEN M. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

COLLINS, KATHLEEN M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALVAREZ, MELISSA

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021006233

1/22/2021: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021006233

COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

1/21/2021: COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-KATHLEEN M COLLINS - ISSUED 01/22/2021

1/21/2021: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-KATHLEEN M COLLINS - ISSUED 01/22/2021

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/21/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

1/21/2021: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$410.00; Amount Paid:$410.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021006233

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-KATHLEEN M COLLINS - ISSUED 01/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALVAREZ, MELISSA