This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/18/2020 at 10:18:03 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST THE HEREIN NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES

Case Summary

On 11/08/2018 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST THE HEREIN NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendants

BELMORE, JODI ELIZABETH

SICKLER, ROBERT JOSEPH

BRADSHAW, LISA MARIE

RITCHIE, ANN TERRI

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS OR BENEFICIARIES OF THE ESTATE OF FRANCIS J SICKLER JR DECEASED

SICKLER, DELIA CHRISTIANA

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST THE HEREIN NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS

UNKNOWN TENANT

SICKLER, DELIA

SICKLER, DELIA M

SICKLER, PAUL FRANCIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRITO, LUIZ

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

1/4/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

CERTIFICATE - OF SERVICE NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

1/4/2019: CERTIFICATE - OF SERVICE NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019001684)

1/4/2019: DISMISSAL - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019001684)

RESPONSE

12/14/2018: RESPONSE

RESPONSE-DELIA SICKLER

12/10/2018: RESPONSE-DELIA SICKLER

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018114410

11/14/2018: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018114410

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ANN TERRI RITCHIE- ISSUED 11/14/2018

11/14/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ANN TERRI RITCHIE- ISSUED 11/14/2018

PAYMENT $985.00 RECEIPT #2018112686

11/8/2018: PAYMENT $985.00 RECEIPT #2018112686

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN TENANT- ISSUED 11/08/2018

11/8/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN TENANT- ISSUED 11/08/2018

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PAUL FRANCIS SICKLER- ISSUED 11/08/2018

11/8/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PAUL FRANCIS SICKLER- ISSUED 11/08/2018

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ROBERT JOSEPH SICKLER- ISSUED 11/08/2018

11/8/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ROBERT JOSEPH SICKLER- ISSUED 11/08/2018

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE UNKNOWN HEIRS OR BENEFICIARIES OF THE ESTATE OF FRANCIS J SICKLER JR A/K/A FRANCIS J SICKLER DECEASED- ISSUED 11/08/2018

11/8/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE UNKNOWN HEIRS OR BENEFICIARIES OF THE ESTATE OF FRANCIS J SICKLER JR A/K/A FRANCIS J SICKLER DECEASED- ISSUED 11/08/2018

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DELIA M SICKLER A/K/A DELIA SICKLER A/K/A DELIA CHRISTIANA SICKLER- ISSUED 11/08/2018

11/8/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DELIA M SICKLER A/K/A DELIA SICKLER A/K/A DELIA CHRISTIANA SICKLER- ISSUED 11/08/2018

CERTIFICATE - ORIGINAL NOTE POSSESSION

11/8/2018: CERTIFICATE - ORIGINAL NOTE POSSESSION

NOTICE - VALUE

11/8/2018: NOTICE - VALUE

LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018147657)

11/8/2018: LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018147657)

COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

11/8/2018: COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/8/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - OF SERVICE NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019001684)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE-DELIA SICKLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018114410

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ANN TERRI RITCHIE- ISSUED 11/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$995.00; Amount Paid:$995.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $985.00 RECEIPT #2018112686

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN TENANT- ISSUED 11/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - CLERK CAN NOT ISSUE DOES NOT MATCH CASE TYPE-

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PAUL FRANCIS SICKLER- ISSUED 11/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ROBERT JOSEPH SICKLER- ISSUED 11/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE UNKNOWN HEIRS OR BENEFICIARIES OF THE ESTATE OF FRANCIS J SICKLER JR A/K/A FRANCIS J SICKLER DECEASED- ISSUED 11/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DELIA M SICKLER A/K/A DELIA SICKLER A/K/A DELIA CHRISTIANA SICKLER- ISSUED 11/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - ORIGINAL NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018147657)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less