This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/19/2020 at 04:03:20 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA, LANCTO, CHAD CHRISTOPHER Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2019 BANK OF AMERICA NA, LANCTO, CHAD CHRISTOPHER was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 SC

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

LANCTO, CHAD CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALMA, JORGE

 

Court Documents

MOTION - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

8/21/2019: MOTION - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

8/21/2019: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT

8/21/2019: NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE - NON-MILITARY

8/21/2019: NOTICE - NON-MILITARY

NOTICE - OF COSTS

8/21/2019: NOTICE - OF COSTS

JUDGMENT - RECORDED - DEFAULT - Recorded (OR. / 2019114969)

8/21/2019: JUDGMENT - RECORDED - DEFAULT - Recorded (OR. / 2019114969)

NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT

8/15/2019: NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

8/15/2019: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

MOTION - FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

8/15/2019: MOTION - FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT - SUPPLEMENTAL NON-MILITARY

7/9/2019: AFFIDAVIT - SUPPLEMENTAL NON-MILITARY

DEFAULT PROPOSED

7/9/2019: DEFAULT PROPOSED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - CHAD CHRISTOPHER LANCTO

7/9/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - CHAD CHRISTOPHER LANCTO

SUMMONS SERVED - CHAD CHRISTOPHER LANCTO

5/10/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - CHAD CHRISTOPHER LANCTO

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019044857

5/3/2019: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019044857

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CHAD CHRISTOPHER LANCTO -ISSUED 05/03/2019

5/2/2019: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CHAD CHRISTOPHER LANCTO -ISSUED 05/03/2019

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

5/2/2019: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

5/2/2019: AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

5/2/2019: COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - NON-MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - DEFAULT - Recorded (OR. / 2019114969)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - SUPPLEMENTAL NON-MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - CHAD CHRISTOPHER LANCTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - CHAD CHRISTOPHER LANCTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019044857

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CHAD CHRISTOPHER LANCTO -ISSUED 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less