This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/25/2022 at 02:59:16 (UTC).

AZOR, CHANTAL Et Al VS HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 AZOR, CHANTAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AZOR, JEAN

AZOR, CHANTAL

Defendant

HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRAPF, GRANT

Defendant Attorney

PRATO, KASEY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/23/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE- AND DESIGNATION OF E MAIL ADDRESS

11/23/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE- AND DESIGNATION OF E MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

11/23/2021: NOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

11/23/2021: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

11/23/2021: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

NOTICE OF FILING- CORRESPONDENCE

11/23/2021: NOTICE OF FILING- CORRESPONDENCE

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/23/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021099596

11/23/2021: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021099596

SUMMONS SERVED - HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSUANCE COMPANY

12/21/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSUANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

12/22/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

MOTION - TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY

12/30/2021: MOTION - TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY

MOTION - STAY DISCOVERY AND/OR MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME PENDING OUTCOME OF MOTION TO DISMISS

1/4/2022: MOTION - STAY DISCOVERY AND/OR MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME PENDING OUTCOME OF MOTION TO DISMISS

RESPONSE - TO MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY OR MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

1/5/2022: RESPONSE - TO MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY OR MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - TO MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY OR MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - STAY DISCOVERY AND/OR MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME PENDING OUTCOME OF MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSUANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$410.00; Amount Paid:$410.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021099596

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- HERITAGE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED - 12/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING- CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE- AND DESIGNATION OF E MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant