This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/03/2021 at 06:48:35 (UTC).

AUFFRET, BARBARA LANG Et Al VS BOETEL, CHARLES Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2014 AUFFRET, BARBARA LANG filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BOETEL, CHARLES. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LANG, CRAIG G

AUFFRET, BARBARA LANG

SIMCOX, ALENA LYRAS

Defendants

BOETEL, CHARLES

BOETEL, RONALD

CHARLES BOETEL AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FOR THE ESTATE OF DOLORES M LANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOSS, MARC

Defendant Attorneys

TRIMYER, BRIAN

GOOD, MARGARET

GARCIA, MARTIN

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2015100020)

8/11/2015: STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2015100020)

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

6/4/2015: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

PROPOSED - ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE

5/5/2015: PROPOSED - ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE

MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE

5/5/2015: MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE

MEDIATION REPORT

4/30/2015: MEDIATION REPORT

NOTICE OF FILING - ACKNOWLEDGMENT BY PLAINTIFFS

4/13/2015: NOTICE OF FILING - ACKNOWLEDGMENT BY PLAINTIFFS

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

2/27/2015: NOTICE OF MEDIATION

NOTICE - PAGE 2 OF SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER AND DEFENSES

1/26/2015: NOTICE - PAGE 2 OF SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER AND DEFENSES

SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER AND DEFENSES

1/26/2015: SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER AND DEFENSES

PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2014110426

9/30/2014: PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2014110426

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - CHARLES BOETEL - CANNOT ISSUE SUMMONS AS NO CIVIL COVER SHEET ON FILE

9/30/2014: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - CHARLES BOETEL - CANNOT ISSUE SUMMONS AS NO CIVIL COVER SHEET ON FILE

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - RONALD BOETEL - CANNOT ISSUE SUMMONS AS NO CIVIL COVER SHEET ON FILE

9/30/2014: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - RONALD BOETEL - CANNOT ISSUE SUMMONS AS NO CIVIL COVER SHEET ON FILE

DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ABATE

9/30/2014: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ABATE

WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

9/15/2014: WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2014102704

9/10/2014: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2014102704

EXHIBIT A -EQUITABLE TRUST AGREEMENT OF GEORGE AND DOLORES LANG

9/10/2014: EXHIBIT A -EQUITABLE TRUST AGREEMENT OF GEORGE AND DOLORES LANG

COMPLAINT

9/10/2014: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS- PROPOSED-CHARLES BOETEL ( NO CIVIL COVER SHEET ON FILE)

9/10/2014: SUMMONS- PROPOSED-CHARLES BOETEL ( NO CIVIL COVER SHEET ON FILE)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2015100020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED - ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - ACKNOWLEDGMENT BY PLAINTIFFS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - PAGE 2 OF SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER AND DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER AND DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRONALD BOETEL'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT VI OF PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2014110426

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - CHARLES BOETEL - CANNOT ISSUE SUMMONS AS NO CIVIL COVER SHEET ON FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - RONALD BOETEL - CANNOT ISSUE SUMMONS AS NO CIVIL COVER SHEET ON FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS MOTION TO ABATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$430.00; Amount Paid:$430.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2014102704

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT A -EQUITABLE TRUST AGREEMENT OF GEORGE AND DOLORES LANG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED-CHARLES BOETEL ( NO CIVIL COVER SHEET ON FILE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOOD, MARGARET

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA, MARTIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRIMYER, BRIAN