This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 03/14/2021 at 23:01:03 (UTC).

ARONS, JERROLD Et Al VS CK LANDHOLDINGS LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2016 ARONS, JERROLD filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CK LANDHOLDINGS LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARONS, JERROLD

JEANNE BERNSTEIN AS TRUSTEE OF THE E&J BERNSTEIN REVOCABLE TRUST

LYDIA MCANDREW AS TRUSTEE OF THE BI COASTAL LIVING TRUST DATED

HIF LENDERS II LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Cross Defendants and Defendants

DEAN, LANCE

CK LANDHOLDINGS LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

JHM VENTURES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

FISCHER, EDWARD

DERR, BRIAN C

DEAN, VERONICA

UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION OF SUBJECT PROPERTY

USA FENCE COMPANY A FLORIDA CORPORATION

CK LANDHOLDINGS LLC

USA FENCE COMPANY

FISHCER, EDWARD

UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

Cross Plaintiff and 3Rd Party Plaintiff

JHM VENTURES

3Rd Party Defendants

HANSON, STEVEN R

LEX PARTNERS LLC

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRAZIER, WILLIAM STAFFORD

Defendant Attorney

KELLY, SEAN

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HARRISON, R CRAIG

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2016119694

11/30/2016: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2016119694

FORECLOSURE FORM B

11/15/2016: FORECLOSURE FORM B

FORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE TITLE PROPOSED

5/9/2017: FORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE TITLE PROPOSED

PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2017014518

2/13/2017: PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2017014518

SUMMONS SERVED - ALIAS - VERONICA DEAN

2/22/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - ALIAS - VERONICA DEAN

ALIAS SUMMONS SERVED - CK LANDHOLDINGS LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

12/12/2016: ALIAS SUMMONS SERVED - CK LANDHOLDINGS LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SUMMONS ALIAS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - VERONICA DEAN - ISSUED 02/13/2017

2/13/2017: SUMMONS ALIAS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - VERONICA DEAN - ISSUED 02/13/2017

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY - ISSUED 11/15/2016

11/15/2016: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY - ISSUED 11/15/2016

SUMMONS ALIAS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - LANCE DEAN - ISSUED 02/13/2017

2/13/2017: SUMMONS ALIAS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - LANCE DEAN - ISSUED 02/13/2017

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017109221)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE TITLE PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSIGNMENT OF BID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM ONLINE; Description:JUDICIAL SALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBID SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION VERIFIED FOR SALE 8/16/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2017068261

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • HearingTime:09:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6C; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - USA FENCE COMPANY A FLORIDA CORPORATION - ISSUED 11/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CK LANDHOLDINGS LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY - ISSUED 11/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FORM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2016141511)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLSE >$250,000

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JHM VENTURES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where USA FENCE COMPANY is a litigant