This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 12/24/2022 at 19:14:44 (UTC).

ARIUM CITRUS RUN Et Al VS SCHEELE, GENEVIEVE

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 ARIUM CITRUS RUN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SCHEELE, GENEVIEVE. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAGAZINE MCINTOSH LP

ARIUM CITRUS RUN

Defendant

SCHEELE, GENEVIEVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCAIN, RYAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/29/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- GENEVIEVE SCHEELE

11/29/2022: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- GENEVIEVE SCHEELE

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

11/29/2022: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2022105092

11/29/2022: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2022105092

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION

12/8/2022: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION

SUMMONS SERVED - GENEVIEVE SCHEELE

12/13/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - GENEVIEVE SCHEELE

MOTION - FOR AN ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

12/14/2022: MOTION - FOR AN ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

NOTICE OF FILING

12/14/2022: NOTICE OF FILING

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FOR AN ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - GENEVIEVE SCHEELE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $195.00; Amount Paid: $195.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION; Total Fee: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2022105092

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- GENEVIEVE SCHEELE - ISSUED 11/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARIUM CITRUS RUN is a litigant

Latest cases where MAGAZINE MCINTOSH LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN MCCAIN