This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/18/2020 at 05:00:27 (UTC).

AQUAFLOW LLC VS AGUABERT LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2018 AQUAFLOW LLC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against AGUABERT LLC. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON and RUHL, MARIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON

RUHL, MARIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AQUAFLOW LLC

Defendants

AGUABERT LLC

GUTIERREZ, ALBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIEGEL, GLENN

Defendant Attorney

SANDERSON, KEVIN

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $105.00 RECEIPT #2018098536

9/28/2018: PAYMENT $105.00 RECEIPT #2018098536

ORDER TO TRANSFER FILE

9/13/2018: ORDER TO TRANSFER FILE

REQUEST- FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

9/7/2018: REQUEST- FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - ROBERT DORF

7/31/2018: SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - ROBERT DORF

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018063636

6/20/2018: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018063636

PAYMENT $0.00 REFUND $165.00 RECEIPT #2018030877

3/23/2018: PAYMENT $0.00 REFUND $165.00 RECEIPT #2018030877

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018030876

3/23/2018: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018030876

LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

3/23/2018: LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

3/23/2018: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

9/14/2018: LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

COMPLAINT - COUNTER - COUNTY AND ANSWER TO AMENDED PETITION - DEFENDANTS

9/11/2018: COMPLAINT - COUNTER - COUNTY AND ANSWER TO AMENDED PETITION - DEFENDANTS

ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

6/27/2018: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

SUMMONS ISSUED - AS TO AMENDED STATEMENT OF CLAIM - AGUABERT LLC

6/20/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - AS TO AMENDED STATEMENT OF CLAIM - AGUABERT LLC

ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

5/10/2018: ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

5/8/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018033299

4/2/2018: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018033299

RECEIPT # 2018030877 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00

3/26/2018: RECEIPT # 2018030877 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- ALBERTO GUTIERREZ

3/23/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- ALBERTO GUTIERREZ

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $105.00 RECEIPT #2018098536

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$400.00; Amount Paid:$105.00; Waived Amount:$295.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketTRANSFERRED FROM 2018 SC 001974 SC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO TRANSFER FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO CIRCUIT COURT - DEFENDANT'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $295.00 RECEIPT #2018092232

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTER - COUNTY AND ANSWER TO AMENDED PETITION - DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST- FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - ROBERT DORF

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018033299

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $165.00 RECEIPT #2018031156

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT # 2018030877 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $0.00 REFUND $165.00 RECEIPT #2018030877

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018030876

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- ALBERTO GUTIERREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 05/09/2018 AT 9:00 AM IN H , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less