This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/24/2021 at 17:55:09 (UTC).

AQUA FINANCE INC VS BRIGGS, RHONDA Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/26/2019 AQUA FINANCE INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRIGGS, RHONDA. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, STEPHEN and RUHL, MARIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 SC

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, STEPHEN

RUHL, MARIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AQUA FINANCE INC

Defendants

BRIGGS, ROBERT

North Port, FL 34288

BRIGGS, RHONDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCADIS, RALPH SAM

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2021006271

1/22/2021: PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2021006271

WRIT PROPOSED

1/22/2021: WRIT PROPOSED

MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

1/22/2021: MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

1/22/2021: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

JUDGMENT - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020168376)

11/30/2020: JUDGMENT - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020168376)

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM AMY J WINARSKY ESQ

11/30/2020: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM AMY J WINARSKY ESQ

AFFIDAVIT

10/29/2020: AFFIDAVIT

MOTION - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

10/29/2020: MOTION - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT - CALCULATION OF INTEREST

10/29/2020: AFFIDAVIT - CALCULATION OF INTEREST

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - ROBERT BRIGGS AND RHONDA BRIGGS

10/1/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - ROBERT BRIGGS AND RHONDA BRIGGS

SUMMONS SERVED RHONDA BRIGGS

12/31/2019: SUMMONS SERVED RHONDA BRIGGS

SUMMONS SERVED - ROBERT BRIGGS

12/31/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - ROBERT BRIGGS

PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2019127788

12/26/2019: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2019127788

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-- RHONDA BRIGGS - ISSUED 12/26/2019

12/23/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-- RHONDA BRIGGS - ISSUED 12/26/2019

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ROBERT BRIGGS - ISSUED 12/26/2019

12/23/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ROBERT BRIGGS - ISSUED 12/26/2019

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

12/23/2019: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

COMPLAINT (SOUTH COUNTY)

12/23/2019: COMPLAINT (SOUTH COUNTY)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/23/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2021006271

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020168376)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM AMY J WINARSKY ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - CALCULATION OF INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COST - PROOF

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - ROBERT BRIGGS AND RHONDA BRIGGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED RHONDA BRIGGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - ROBERT BRIGGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$505.00; Amount Paid:$505.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2019127788

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-- RHONDA BRIGGS - ISSUED 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ROBERT BRIGGS - ISSUED 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AQUA FINANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcadis, Ralph S